Vladimir Putin
President of the Russian Federation, Supreme Commander-in-Chief of the Armed Forces of the Russian FederationBiography
Born on 7 October 1952 in the city of Leningrad (now St. Petersburg).
In 1975, graduated from the Law Department of the Leningrad State University.
He was placed on a job within the state security bodies. In 1985–1990, worked in the German Democratic Republic.
From 1990 — the Assistant Rector of the Leningrad State University for international affairs, later — the Counsellor to the Leningrad City Council’s Chairman.
From June 1991 — the Chairman of the Committee for External Relations of the St. Petersburg Mayor's Office; simultaneously from 1994 – the First Deputy Mayor of St. Petersburg.
From August 1996 — the Deputy Head of the RF Presidential Affairs’ Department.
From March 1997 — the Deputy Head of the RF Presidential Executive Office, Chief of the RF Presidential Main Control Directorate.
From May 1998 — the First Deputy Head of the RF Presidential Executive Office.
In July 1998, appointed the Director of the Federal Security Service (FSS) of the Russian Federation; from March 1999, in parallel the Secretary of the RF Security Council.
From August 1999 — the Chairman of the Government of the Russian Federation.
From 31 December 1999 — the Acting President of the Russian Federation.
On 26 March 2000 he was elected as the President of the Russian Federation. Entered office on 7 May 2000.
On 14 March 2004 was elected as the President of the Russian Federation for a second term.
By the Presidential Decree of 8 May 2008 he was appointed the Chairman of the Government of the Russian Federation.
On 4 March 2012 he has been elected as the President of the Russian Federation. Entered office on 7 May 2012.
Cand. Sc (Economics).
Has an advanced level of German and English languages.