Speeches First speech Browse all speeches (Hansard) Biography Parliamentary service Chosen by the Parliament of New South Wales on 21.8.2013 under section 15 of the Constitution to represent that State in the Senate, vice Hon. M Thistlethwaite (resigned). Elected to the Senate for New South Wales 2016. Resigned 25.1.2018. Parliamentary positions Temporary Chair of Committees from 7.7.14 to 9.5.16 Committee service Senate Standing: Regulations and Ordinances from 12.11.2013 to 12.11.2015; Procedure from 1.9.2016 to 12.9.2016; Selection of Bills from 1.9.2016 to 12.9.2016; Community Affairs: Legislation from 10.10.2016 to 15.2.2017; Selection of Bills from 8.2.2017; Publications from 16.2.2017. Senate Select: Abbott Government's Commission of Audit from 12.12.2013 to 19.6.2014; Abbott Government's Budget Cuts from 26.6.2014 to 11.8.2015; Scrutiny of Government Budget Measures from 11.8.2015 to 25.2.2016; Health from 11.12.2015 to 11.12.2015 (Substitute member from 11.12.2015 to 11.12.2015); School Funding Investment from 4.2.2016 to 9.5.2016 (Chair from 4.2.2016 to 9.5.2016); Red Tape from 10.11.2016 to 30.3.2017; Future of Public Interest Journalism from 11.5.2017 to 6.12.2017. Senate Legislative and General Purpose Standing: Economics: References from 12.11.2013 to 9.5.2016 (Chair from 1.7.2014 to 9.5.2016); Foreign Affairs, Defence and Trade: References from 12.11.2013 to 9.5.2016; Economics: Legislation from 1.7.2014 to 9.5.2016 (Deputy Chair from 1.7.2014 to 9.5.2016); Environment and Communications: Legislation from 20.10.2015 to 20.10.2015 (Substitute member from 20.10.2015 to 20.10.2015); Environment and Communications: Legislation from 30.11.2015 to 9.5.2016; Environment and Communications: Legislation from 9.2.2016 to 9.2.2016 (Substitute member from 9.2.2016 to 9.2.2016); Environment and Communications: References from 1.9.2016; Foreign Affairs, Defence and Trade: References from 1.9.2016 to 8.11.2016; Economics: References from 1.9.2016. Joint Statutory: Corporations and Financial Services from 4.12.2013 to 1.7.2014. Joint Standing: Migration from 4.12.2013 to 9.5.2016; Migration from 12.9.2016; Treaties from 8.11.2016. Parliamentary party positions Shadow Parliamentary Secretary to the Leader of the Opposition from 13.10.2015 to 23.7.2016.Deputy Manager of Opposition Business in the Senate from 13.10.2015 to 9.5.2016.Shadow Parliamentary Secretary for School Education and Youth from 13.10.2015 to 23.7.2016.Shadow Minister for Consumer Affairs from 23.7.2016 to 7.9.2016.Manager of Opposition Business in the Senate from 23.7.2016 to 7.9.2016.Opposition Deputy Whip in the Senate from 3.2.2017 to 29.11.2017. Party positions Member, ALP from 2000Delegate, ALP Annual Conference (NSW) from 2003President, Young Labor (NSW) 2005Member, ALP Administrative Committee (NSW) 2005Secretary, Drummoyne SEC 2006Delegate, ALP National Conference 2007Secretary, Lowe FEC 2008State Organiser, ALP (NSW) 2008-09Delegate, ALP National Conference 2009Member, ALP Administrative Committee (NSW) 2010-13General Secretary, ALP (NSW) 2010-13Member, ALP National Executive 2010-13Delegate, ALP National Conference 2011 Personal Born 28.7.1983, Sari, IranMarried Qualifications and occupation before entering Federal Parliament B.A(Macq.)